Related Topics:

More Math Tricks and Tricks

Math Worksheets

**Fun Fast Multiplication Trick!**

A neat trick to quickly multiply two 2-digit numbers together!

Examples:

23 × 46 =

55 × 81 =

**Fast Math Tricks - How to multiply 2 digit numbers up to 100 - the fast way!**

Using this method you will be able to multiply any pair of two digit numbers with each other - faster than a calculator! Become a math genius in no time at all using vedic math!

Examples:

21 × 31 =

43 × 21 =

42 × 63 =

22 × 32 =

51 × 63 =

82 × 51 =

**Fast Math Tricks - multiplication of two and three digit numbers**

How to multiply numbers numbers calculating the fast way! Using this method you will be able to multiply any pair of two and three digit numbers with each other quickly and accurately! Become a math genius in no time at all using vedic math!

Examples:

121 × 23 =

242 × 32 =

122 × 32 =

153 × 61 =

**Math Trick: Multiplying Trick**

In this math trick video we look at an easy way to**multiply numbers where the ten's digit is the same and the one's digit adds up to 10**.

Example:

To find 52 x 58

Take the ten's digit and multiply it by the next highest number. 5 X 6 = 30.

Next, multiply the one's digit. 2 x 8 = 16. The answer is 3016

Examples:

23 × 27 =

82 × 88 =

112 × 118 =

45 × 45 =

13 × 17 =

**Fast Mental Multiplication Trick - multiply in your head using base 10**

This mental multiplication trick uses the idea of a third number - a base number - to help us multiply two numbers in your head. This lesson looks at multiplying numbers near 10 using base 10.

Examples:

14 × 12 =

15 × 13 =

17 × 12 =

8 × 17 =

9 × 9 =

19 × 21 =

14 × 13 =

9 × 18 =

15 × 15 =

**Fast Mental Multiplication Trick - Multiply in your head using base 20 and 30**

How to multiply numbers near 20 and 30?

Examples:

25 × 23 =

27 × 22 =

28 × 19 =

32 × 18 =

26 × 35 =

31 × 39 =

23 × 22 =

29 × 19 =

36 × 29 =

25 × 22 =

18 × 19 =

33 × 27 =

**Fast Mental Multiplication Trick - Multiply in your head using base 50**

How to multiply numbers near 50?

Examples:

51 × 53 =

52 × 54 =

52 × 57 =

52 × 48 =

41 × 56 =

53 × 54 =

53 × 48 =

42 × 49 =

21 × 17 =

32 × 22 =

53 × 48 =

**Fast Mental Multiplication Trick - Multiply in your head using base 100**

How to multiply numbers near 100?

Examples:

105 × 107 =

109 × 102 =

106 × 97 =

112 × 109 =

105 × 101 =

97 × 93 =

92 × 112 =

21 × 14 =

36 × 29 =

55 × 56 =

104 × 97 =

You can use the free Mathway calculator and problem solver below to practice Algebra or other math topics. Try the given examples, or type in your own problem and check your answer with the step-by-step explanations.

More Math Tricks and Tricks

Math Worksheets

The following diagram shows multiplication trick. Scroll down the page for more examples and solutions on how to use the multiplication short cut.

The following videos show some math tricks that will help you to do mental math for multiplying 2-digit numbers quickly and efficiently.A neat trick to quickly multiply two 2-digit numbers together!

Examples:

23 × 46 =

55 × 81 =

Using this method you will be able to multiply any pair of two digit numbers with each other - faster than a calculator! Become a math genius in no time at all using vedic math!

Examples:

21 × 31 =

43 × 21 =

42 × 63 =

22 × 32 =

51 × 63 =

82 × 51 =

How to multiply numbers numbers calculating the fast way! Using this method you will be able to multiply any pair of two and three digit numbers with each other quickly and accurately! Become a math genius in no time at all using vedic math!

Examples:

121 × 23 =

242 × 32 =

122 × 32 =

153 × 61 =

In this math trick video we look at an easy way to

Example:

To find 52 x 58

Take the ten's digit and multiply it by the next highest number. 5 X 6 = 30.

Next, multiply the one's digit. 2 x 8 = 16. The answer is 3016

Examples:

23 × 27 =

82 × 88 =

112 × 118 =

45 × 45 =

13 × 17 =

This mental multiplication trick uses the idea of a third number - a base number - to help us multiply two numbers in your head. This lesson looks at multiplying numbers near 10 using base 10.

Examples:

14 × 12 =

15 × 13 =

17 × 12 =

8 × 17 =

9 × 9 =

19 × 21 =

14 × 13 =

9 × 18 =

15 × 15 =

How to multiply numbers near 20 and 30?

Examples:

25 × 23 =

27 × 22 =

28 × 19 =

32 × 18 =

26 × 35 =

31 × 39 =

23 × 22 =

29 × 19 =

36 × 29 =

25 × 22 =

18 × 19 =

33 × 27 =

How to multiply numbers near 50?

Examples:

51 × 53 =

52 × 54 =

52 × 57 =

52 × 48 =

41 × 56 =

53 × 54 =

53 × 48 =

42 × 49 =

21 × 17 =

32 × 22 =

53 × 48 =

How to multiply numbers near 100?

Examples:

105 × 107 =

109 × 102 =

106 × 97 =

112 × 109 =

105 × 101 =

97 × 93 =

92 × 112 =

21 × 14 =

36 × 29 =

55 × 56 =

104 × 97 =

Rotate to landscape screen format on a mobile phone or small tablet to use the **Mathway** widget, a free math problem solver that **answers your questions with step-by-step explanations**.

You can use the free Mathway calculator and problem solver below to practice Algebra or other math topics. Try the given examples, or type in your own problem and check your answer with the step-by-step explanations.

We welcome your feedback, comments and questions about this site or page. Please submit your feedback or enquiries via our Feedback page.